U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00269-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ADEBOYE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Bond Hearing/Pretrial Release]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 21, 2021: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 20, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • April 20, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 02, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • March 24, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • March 24, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 24, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • March 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.