U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00234-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RENARD, et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 26, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 22, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 13, 2021: [Entry]
  • April 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 12, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 09, 2021: [Pretrial Detention]
  • April 09, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • April 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • April 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • April 02, 2021: [Empty Text]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • March 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • March 25, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order on Motion]
  • March 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.