U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00291-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JACKSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 09, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 13, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 28, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 05, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 29, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • March 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 25, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • March 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.