U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00282-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FIELDS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 04, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 06, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Entry]
  • March 31, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 31, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • March 29, 2021: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • March 29, 2021: [~Util - Complaint Unsealed]
  • March 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.