U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00307-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TRIVEDI
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal/Maintain Under Seal Document]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 08, 2021: [Probable Cause/Detention Hearing]
  • April 07, 2021: [Submission]
  • April 06, 2021: [Seal a Document (Motion to Seal or Motion to Maintain Under Seal)]
  • April 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • April 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2021: [Empty Text]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 31, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.