U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mc-00013
  • Case Name: In Re: Application for Admission to Practice Pursuant to Local Rule 83-9 for Legal Interns
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 28, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.