U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00327-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCDONOUGH
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 01, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 19, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 10, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 16, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • April 13, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • April 08, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 08, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.