U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00319-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SUTTON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 26, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 24, 2021: [Continue]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Waiver of Detention]
  • April 30, 2021: [Probable Cause/Detention Hearing]
  • April 30, 2021: [Notice of IFCD Attorney Designation]
  • April 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • April 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • April 08, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 08, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.