U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00308-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BROOKS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 15, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 13, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 13, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 15, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 14, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 04, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Entry]
  • April 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.