U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-mj-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GREEN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 15, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 14, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 05, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • April 21, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • April 21, 2021: [0 - Docket Text Only]
  • April 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 20, 2021: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • April 13, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
  • April 13, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.