U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00347-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BROWN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 25, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • April 21, 2021: [Notice of IFCD Attorney Designation]
  • April 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • April 16, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 16, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • April 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.