U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00069-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Spangle
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 10, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 10, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 28, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 23, 2021: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order]
  • April 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 21, 2021: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • April 21, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 20, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 20, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.