U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00366-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MEADOR
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 18, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 18, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 24, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 10, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Entry]
  • April 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 25, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
  • April 23, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 23, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.