U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00023
  • Case Name: IN RE: RIOS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Return of Service (Attorney Discipline)]
  • March 08, 2022: [Reassignment Letter (Recusal/Related Case/Workload/Other)]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order to Show Cause (Disciplinary)]
  • March 01, 2022: [MISC (Notice of Disciplinary Action)]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Return of Service (Attorney Discipline)]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order of Attorney Discipline]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order to Show Cause (Disciplinary)]
  • April 23, 2021: [MISC (Notice of Disciplinary Action)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.