U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00371-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MENDEZ-RODRIGUEZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 22, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 28, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • September 28, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • September 27, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 27, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 05, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 12, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 14, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • May 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • May 05, 2021: [Empty Text]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 29, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.