U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00339-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CACERES
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 10, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion]
  • May 13, 2021: [Submission]
  • May 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 12, 2021: [Motion (Other)]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 11, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • May 11, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • May 05, 2021: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 04, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • May 04, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.