U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00405-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CRUZ-RIVERA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 18, 2021: [Official Transcript]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 02, 2021: [Redaction Statement - Transcript (optional Case participants - doc)]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 12, 2021: [Official Transcript]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Probable Cause/Detention Hearing]
  • May 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • May 09, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • May 06, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 06, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.