U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00411-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DENNEMANN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 24, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • May 10, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • May 10, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • May 10, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 10, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 10, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.