U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BLACKWELL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 14, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 13, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • May 11, 2021: [~Util - Complaint Unsealed]
  • May 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.