U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00466-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCCUTCHEON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Probable Cause/Detention Hearing]
  • May 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • May 18, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 17, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • May 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.