U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00455-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FARRIS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 20, 2021: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 13, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion]
  • July 27, 2021: [Motion (Other)]
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 19, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.