U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MARKET
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [CJA - Summary of Payments]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Official Transcript]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 27, 2021: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing]
  • May 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order]
  • May 25, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • May 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2021: [Submission]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.