U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00517-1
  • Case Name: USA v. THOMAS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • July 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 16, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 15, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 15, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 14, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 07, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 07, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.