U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00516-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MARTINEZ et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 16, 2021: [Waiver of Detention]
  • June 16, 2021: [Probable Cause/Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • June 14, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • June 07, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 07, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.