U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00522-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CASS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 24, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • June 10, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 09, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • June 08, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 08, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.