U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00506-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MILLER et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • June 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 18, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 11, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 10, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 10, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.