U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00530-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FORD
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 06, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Entry]
  • June 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 14, 2021: [Waiver of Detention]
  • June 11, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • June 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 11, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • June 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.