U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00527-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CABELL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 21, 2021: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • June 21, 2021: [Submission]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • June 18, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • June 15, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 14, 2021: [~Util - Complaint Unsealed]
  • June 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.