U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00040-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Ott
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • June 23, 2021: [Commitment to Another District]
  • June 23, 2021: [Waiver of Rule 5 Hearings]
  • June 23, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 21, 2021: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • June 21, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5c3 - formerly Rule 40]
  • June 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
  • June 16, 2021: [Arrest - Rule 5]
  • June 16, 2021: [Rule 5c3 Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.