U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00548-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ENRIQUEZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 27, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 13, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 23, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • June 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 18, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • June 16, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 16, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • June 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.