U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00012
  • Case Name: Triad Piling Products, LLC v. Bourounis
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 05, 2022: [Stay]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Status Report]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 05, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice - Other]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order]
  • July 27, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 22, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • June 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.