U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00591-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ELDRIDGE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • July 06, 2021: [Pretrial Detention]
  • July 06, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 29, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 28, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
  • June 28, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 28, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.