U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00044
  • Case Name: GRANDHE et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Closed Dismissed]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • July 16, 2021: [Entry]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Receipt]
  • June 28, 2021: [Appear pro hac vice]
  • June 28, 2021: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.