U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-00064-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Murel
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 12, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2021: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • July 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 01, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
  • July 01, 2021: [Arrest ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.