U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MEEHAN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 23, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Redaction Statement - Transcript (optional Case participants - doc)]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 23, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • September 06, 2021: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 06, 2021: [Official Transcript]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 12, 2021: [Pretrial Detention]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Entry]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 29, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 27, 2021: [Entry]
  • July 26, 2021: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 20, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
  • July 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.