U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00661-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CAGE et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • August 17, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 16, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 03, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 15, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.