U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00676-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DICKERSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [CJA - Summary of Payments]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.