U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-mc-00002
  • Case Name: IN RE CORLAN ROMEL PHILLIPS CUSTODIANSHIP
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Motion (Other)]
  • October 03, 2022: [Submission]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Submission]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Submission]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Submission]
  • June 01, 2022: [Submission]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [MARGINAL ENTRY]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Submission]
  • July 28, 2021: [Response (Use Only if directed by Clerks Office)]
  • July 23, 2021: [MARGINAL ENTRY]
  • July 22, 2021: [Response (Use Only if directed by Clerks Office)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.