U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00688-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BURNETT
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 04, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 02, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 11, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • August 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • July 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 26, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 26, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.