U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00139-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Roberts
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 11, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 11, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 11, 2021: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • August 11, 2021: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • August 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 09, 2021: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • August 09, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 06, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order]
  • August 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 06, 2021: [Arrest ]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.