U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00713-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MONDAY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • August 13, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • August 12, 2021: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • August 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • August 11, 2021: [Entry]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • August 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • August 03, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 02, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 02, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.