U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00722-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PRESTON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Entry]
  • August 20, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • August 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 04, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
  • August 04, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 04, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.