U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mc-00048
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Devin Bynum
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice - Other]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice - Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.