U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00027
  • Case Name: Proffit v. Highlands Hospital Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Opinion and Order]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 01, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 17, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 16, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 16, 2021: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.