U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00757-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ANDERSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 09, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • August 30, 2021: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • August 20, 2021: [Entry]
  • August 20, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • August 18, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 18, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.