U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00753-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SOLOMON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 11, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 13, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 12, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 14, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 20, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 20, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • August 18, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 18, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.