U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-00069-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Dominguez-Carmona
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • September 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • September 02, 2021: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • September 01, 2021: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • September 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 01, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 30, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 26, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 26, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.