U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00781-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NELSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Submission]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 23, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 15, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 11, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 15, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 20, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 03, 2021: [Probable Cause/Detention Hearing]
  • September 02, 2021: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • September 01, 2021: [Empty Text]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • August 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 27, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • August 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 25, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.