U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00773-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RAUPP
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 08, 2021: [Dismiss]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Entry]
  • September 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Waiver of Detention]
  • August 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 26, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • August 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 25, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.