U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00711-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MARTINEZ, et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 21, 2022: [Dismiss]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 17, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 17, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • December 06, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 06, 2021: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • December 03, 2021: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion]
  • November 22, 2021: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • November 19, 2021: [Motion (Other)]
  • November 18, 2021: [Motion (Other)]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 09, 2021: [Dismiss]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 27, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • September 24, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • September 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 07, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 25, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 25, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.